open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina
    Case Number:19-03165-hb
    Party Name:Linda Jo Prince and John Douglas Prince
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Confirmation Hearing Held (batch)]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Amended Schedules/Statements]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Hearing Notice (Confirmation)]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Plan - Modified Plan]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Calendar Removal Request]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Certification of No Response and Request for 362 Default Order]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Filing Fee - Installment Payment]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Certificate of Service BNC Document]
    Date Published:June 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Certificate of Service BNC Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:June 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Pay Filing Fees in Installment]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Deficiency Notice (General)]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Debtor's Election Re: Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Plan - Valuation Included in Ch. 13 Plan]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Plan - Lien Avoidance Included in Ch. 13 Plan]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Plan]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Bankruptcy Form 121 SSN]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (atty)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Ch 13 Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.scb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?290328
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =