open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina
    Case Number:19-03164-jw
    Party Name:Robert L. Bailey, Jr.
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Confirmation Hearing Held (batch)]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Dismiss Case (with PDF) (order)]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal ]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Notice of Change of Address - No PDF Required]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Statement in Support of Confirmation]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Plan - Valuation Included in Ch. 13 Plan]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Plan - Lien Avoidance Included in Ch. 13 Plan]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Plan]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Copies of Payment Advices]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Schedules/Statements Filed]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Notice and Motion for Dismissal at Confirmation]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Certificate of Service BNC Document]
    Date Published:June 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Certificate of Service BNC Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:June 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [UST/Trustee Notice of Filings Due]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Procedures for Loss Mitigation/Mortgage Modification (order)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (atty)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Ch 13 Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Bankruptcy Form 121 SSN]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Debtor's Election Re: Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.scb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?290327
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =