open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina
    Case Number:19-03163-dd
    Party Name:John Robinson, Jr.
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Certificate of Service BNC Discharge/Closing]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Close Bankruptcy Case Auto]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Discharging Debtor 7/Trustee/Closing Case Auto]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Avoid Lien (order)]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Hearing Notice (Passive)]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Avoid Lien (without passive hearing notice)]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Certificate of Service BNC Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:June 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Ch 7 Individual (No Asset) Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Copies of Payment Advices]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Copies of Payment Advices]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Bankruptcy Form 121 SSN]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Debtor's Election Re: Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (atty)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.scb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?290326
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =