open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina
    Case Number:19-03692-dd
    Party Name:Justin Andrew Rosa
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Certificate of Service BNC Discharge]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Discharging Debtor 7 (order)]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Amended Schedules/Statements]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Set Proof of Claim Deadline (ADI)]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Certificate of Service BNC Claim Notice]
    Date Published:September 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Notice To File Claims]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Trustees Notice of Assets]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Trustees Entry of Further Action]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Certificate of Service BNC Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:July 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Ch 7 Individual (No Asset) Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Bankruptcy Form 121 SSN]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Copies of Payment Advices]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Debtor's Election Re: Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (atty)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.scb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?290863
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =