open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina

SOUTH CAROLINA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina
    Case Number:19-04286-jw
    Party Name:Detra Renee Tart
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (order)]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Request for Order Confirming Plan]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Certificate of Service BNC Document]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Certificate of Service BNC Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Notice and Motion for Dismissal at Confirmation]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Procedures for Loss Mitigation/Mortgage Modification (order)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Consent Allowing Payment of Funds to Creditor/Debtor Attorney - Non-Conduit]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Statement in Support of Confirmation]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Plan - Lien Avoidance Included in Ch. 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Plan]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (atty)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Ch 13 Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Bankruptcy Form 121 SSN]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Copies of Payment Advices]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Debtor's Election Re: Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.scb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?291465
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =