open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina

SOUTH CAROLINA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina
    Case Number:19-04307-hb
    Party Name:Linda Marie McCormick
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Certificate of Service BNC Document]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:November 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Certificate of Service BNC Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Ch 7 Individual (No Asset) Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (atty)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Bankruptcy Form 121 SSN]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Debtor's Election Re: Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.scb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?291488
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =