open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina

SOUTH CAROLINA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina
    Case Number:19-04306-dd
    Party Name:Michael John Chialastri and Kathleen Chialastri
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Certificate of Service BNC Discharge/Closing]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Discharging Debtor 7/Trustee/Closing Case (order)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Certificate of Service BNC Document]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Certificate of Service BNC Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Copies of Payment Advices]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Ch 7 Individual (No Asset) Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Debtor's Election Re: Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (atty)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Bankruptcy Form 121 SSN]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.scb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?291487
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =