open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina

SOUTH CAROLINA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina
    Case Number:20-00806-hb
    Party Name:Jamison David Rhoads and Kathleen Michelle Rhoads
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Notice of Change of Address - No PDF Required]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Certificate of Service BNC Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:February 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Ch 7 Individual (No Asset) Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Copies of Payment Advices]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Debtor's Election Re: Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (atty)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Bankruptcy Form 121 SSN]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.scb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?294878
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =