open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina

SOUTH CAROLINA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina
    Case Number:20-03180-hb
    Party Name:Margaret King Capell
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:September 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:September 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Certificate of Service BNC Document]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Pay Wages To Trustee (order)]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Trustees Proposed Order To Pay]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Notice Regarding Reset of Meeting of Creditors to Telephonic Meeting]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Certificate of Service BNC Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Plan - Valuation Included in Ch. 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Plan - Lien Avoidance Included in Ch. 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Plan]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Ch 13 Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Debtor's Election Re: Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Bankruptcy Form 121 SSN]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Copies of Payment Advices]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (atty)]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.scb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?297296
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =