open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

TENNESSEE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00172
    Party Name:Shoffnerkalthoff MES, Inc. v. Rudolph/Libbe, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Hearing]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Magistrate and Order of Reference]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Consent/Nonconsent]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Hearing]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Corporate Interest]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Regarding Availability of Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Governing Motions To Dismiss]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Governing Depositions]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Corporate Interest]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.tned.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?90507
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =