open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00213
    Party Name:Durham et al v. Knox County et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Regarding Availability of Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remand to State Court]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Governing Motions To Dismiss]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Governing Depositions]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.tned.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?90509
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =