open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Texas

TEXAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Texas
    Case Number:2:15-cv-01928
    Party Name:eCeipt LLC v. Square Inc
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:March 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:February 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
    Date Published:February 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:February 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:February 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:February 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint]
    Date Published:December 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:December 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:December 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Magistrate Availability]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Demand]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.txed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?164605
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =