open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Texas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Texas
    Case Number:5:19-cr-00062-1
    Party Name:USA v. Nichols, Jr.
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Disclosure of PSR to Attorneys]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Accepting Findings of Fact (Plea)]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Sentencing]
    Date Published:March 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rearraignment]
    Date Published:March 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Findings of Fact on Plea]
    Date Published:March 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Rearraignment]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Referral on Plea (Rule 11)]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Concerning Discovery & Pre-Trial Motions]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Attorney]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting District Court Arraignment]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Filed]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment Unsealed]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1002958
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =