Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Texas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Texas
    Case Number:19-40621-mxm13
    Party Name:Crystal Kuberski
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bassel, Pam [Meeting of creditors chapter 13 (held) batch]
    Date Published:April 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bassel, Pam [Objection to confirmation of plan]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bassel, Pam [Notice of confirmation hearing on final 13 plan]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bassel, Pam [Financial management course (batch)]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bassel, Pam [Matrix]
    Date Published:February 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bassel, Pam [Employee income records]
    Date Published:February 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bassel, Pam [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)]
    Date Published:February 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bassel, Pam [Statement of financial affairs]
    Date Published:February 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bassel, Pam [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:February 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bassel, Pam [Schedules]
    Date Published:February 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bassel, Pam [Notice of appearance and request for notice (crbatch)]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bassel, Pam [BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bassel, Pam [BNC certificate of mailing]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bassel, Pam [Certificate concerning tax returns]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bassel, Pam [Notice of appearance and request for notice]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bassel, Pam [Notice of deficiency]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bassel, Pam [Meeting of creditors 13 - AutoAssign]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bassel, Pam [none]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [none]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bassel, Pam [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 (case upload)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bassel, Pam [Certificate of credit counseling (case upload)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 (case upload)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of credit counseling (case upload)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?471640
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =