Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Texas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Texas
    Case Number:19-30805
    Party Name:Craig Anthony Lewis
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice Resetting Dismissal Hearing]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice Rescheduling Confirmation Hearing (BNC NOTICING)]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)]
    Date Published:April 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Schedule J]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Schedule G]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Chapter 13 Meeting of Creditors Held - Trustee Does Not Recommend Confirmation]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Confirmation Hearing and Plan Summary (batch)(BNC NOTICING)]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Chapter 13 Meeting of Creditors (batch)(BNC NOTICING)]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Certificate of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:February 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Employer Pay Trustee]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Creditors)]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Declaration for Electronic Filing and Statement of SSN Submitted]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Proposed Wage Order]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Order on Chapter 13 Fixed Fee Agreement (FORMS)]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Chapter 13 Fixed Fee Agreement]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Certificate of Service of Tax Information to Taxing Authority]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Pay Advices or Certification]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Order: Possible Future Dismissal of Case]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Notice of Credit Counseling (FORMS)]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Initial Order for Chapter 13 Case]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Notice of Duplicate Case Filing]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Chapter 13 Plan Summary and Statistical Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) [system event]]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [none]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?429951
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =