Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Texas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Texas
    Case Number:5:19-cv-00034
    Party Name:Carson v. Malone et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Magistrate Availability]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?188410
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =