Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Texas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Texas
    Case Number:4:19-cv-00962
    Party Name:Kadi v. Autumn Chace Homeowners' Aoscciation et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of Service Executed]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:April 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reset]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order for Initial Conference - FORM]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening (FORM, noticing)]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1647139
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =