open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Texas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Texas
    Case Number:19-41611-mxm7
    Party Name:Charles R. McDonald, Jr.
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Garner, Marilyn [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Garner, Marilyn [Financial management course]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Garner, Marilyn [BNC certificate of mailing]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Garner, Marilyn [Notice of deficiency financial management course]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Garner, Marilyn [BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Garner, Marilyn [Notice of appearance and request for notice]
    Date Published:April 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Garner, Marilyn [Meeting of creditors 7 no asset - AutoAssign]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Garner, Marilyn [none]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Garner, Marilyn [Voluntary petition chapter 7 (attorney filer)]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Garner, Marilyn [Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary petition chapter 7 (attorney filer)]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?473873
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =