open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Texas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Texas
    Case Number:19-10146
    Party Name:Maria Del Rosario Lozano
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Curtis, Catherine Stone [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Curtis, Catherine Stone [Automatic Discharge of Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Curtis, Catherine Stone [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Curtis, Catherine Stone [Certificate of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:June 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Curtis, Catherine Stone [Schedule C]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Curtis, Catherine Stone [Schedule A/B]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Curtis, Catherine Stone [Chapter 7 341 Meeting Held/Asset]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Curtis, Catherine Stone [Reaffirmation Agreement (Creditors)]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Curtis, Catherine Stone [Declaration for Electronic Filing and Statement of SSN Submitted]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Curtis, Catherine Stone [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Curtis, Catherine Stone [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Curtis, Catherine Stone [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Curtis, Catherine Stone [Initial Order for Prosecution (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Curtis, Catherine Stone [Notice of Duplicate Case Filing]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Curtis, Catherine Stone [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Creditors)]
    Date Published:April 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Curtis, Catherine Stone [none]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Curtis, Catherine Stone [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Curtis, Catherine Stone [Pay Advices or Certification]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Curtis, Catherine Stone [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income 122A-1 and Exemption of Abuse 122A-1 Supp]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Curtis, Catherine Stone [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) [system event]]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?432000
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =