open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Texas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Texas
    Case Number:19-32208
    Party Name:Shalondra LaKay Fearence
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Courtroom Minutes/Order - C5 LZP JB - C2 MI DJ ER KB JN]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Notice on Financial Management Chapter 13 ADI (FORMS)]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Chapter 13 Meeting of Creditors Held - Trustee Does Not Recommend Confirmation]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:May 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Confirmation Hearing and Plan Summary (batch)(BNC NOTICING)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Chapter 13 Meeting of Creditors (batch)(BNC NOTICING)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Statement of Social Security Number(s) Submitted]
    Date Published:May 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Summary of Assets and Liabilities Form 106Sum]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Schedule J]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Schedule I]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Schedule H]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Schedule G]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Schedule E/F]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Schedule D]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Schedule C]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Schedule A/B]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income Form 122C-1]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Pay Advices or Certification]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Initial Order for Chapter 13 Case]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Order: Possible Future Dismissal of Case]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Order on Chapter 13 Fixed Fee Agreement (FORMS)]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Employer Pay Trustee]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Notice of Duplicate Case Filing]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [none]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Notice Appointing Successor Trustee]
    Date Published:April 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Judge Bohm Amended Claim Order]
    Date Published:April 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Peake, David G [Judge Bohm Order Regarding Lift Stay]
    Date Published:April 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Heitkamp, William E. [Judge Bohm Amended Claim Order]
    Date Published:April 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Heitkamp, William E. [Judge Bohm Order Regarding Lift Stay]
    Date Published:April 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Heitkamp, William E. [Chapter 13 Fixed Fee Agreement]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Heitkamp, William E. [Proposed Wage Order]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Heitkamp, William E. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Heitkamp, William E. [Chapter 13 Plan Summary and Statistical Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Heitkamp, William E. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Heitkamp, William E. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) [system event]]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?431998
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =