Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Texas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Texas
    Case Number:19-32213
    Party Name:Anita M Evans
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sommers, Ronald J [Notice of Proposed Abandonment (FORMS)]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sommers, Ronald J [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sommers, Ronald J [Certificate of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sommers, Ronald J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sommers, Ronald J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sommers, Ronald J [Statement of Social Security Number(s) Submitted]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sommers, Ronald J [Initial Order for Prosecution (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sommers, Ronald J [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sommers, Ronald J [none]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sommers, Ronald J [Pay Advices or Certification]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Pay Advices or Certification]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sommers, Ronald J [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sommers, Ronald J [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) [system event]]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) [system event]]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?432004
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =