open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Texas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Texas
    Case Number:5:11-cr-00219-1
    Party Name:USA v. De La Cruz Bautista
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment for Revocation]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [SRT Violation - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Criminal]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer Probation Jurisdiction within District (PROB 22B)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add US Agencies]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?865799
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =