open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Texas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Texas
    Case Number:6:19-cr-00151-2
    Party Name:USA v. Smoler et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consolidate Cases]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Accepting Waiver of Appearance at Arraignment]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Appearance]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Concerning Courtroom Decorum]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Appearance at Arraignment AND Waiver of Minimum Time to Trial]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Filed]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Redacted Indictment/Information]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Temporary Detention]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Counsel]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (SEALED)]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Personal Data Sheet (SEALED)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1027912
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =