open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Texas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Texas
    Case Number:6:19-cr-00173-1
    Party Name:USA v. McCraw
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Accepting Findings of Fact (Plea)]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Sentencing]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Referral on Plea (Rule 11)]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Findings of Fact on Plea]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rearraignment]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent to Plea before Magistrate (Rule 11)]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Factual Basis]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Concerning Courtroom Decorum]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Accepting Waiver of Appearance at Arraignment]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Appearance]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting District Court Arraignment]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Counsel]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (SEALED)]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver - Proceed via Video Conference]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Clerk's Copy]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Personal Data Sheet (SEALED)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1035890
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =