open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Texas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Texas
    Case Number:4:19-cr-00439-1
    Party Name:USA v. Ordaz-Ramon
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Substitution for USA or FPD]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery Order - FORM]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order (FORM)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance ADI]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer Case]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Services Report (Sealed)]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Federal Public Defender]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Docket Control Order]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention (FORM)]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (Sealed)]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appointing Public Defender (FORM)]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Issuance]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1677036
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =