open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Texas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Texas
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00250
    Party Name:Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC v. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Designation of Attorney in Charge]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:August 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Counterclaim]
    Date Published:August 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Counterclaim]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Magistrate Availability]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Demand]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?190803
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =