open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Texas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Texas
    Case Number:4:19-cr-00532-1
    Party Name:USA v. Gonzalez-Medero
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Accepting Findings of Fact (Plea)]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Sentencing]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Findings of Fact on Plea]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rearraignment]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent to Plea before Magistrate (Rule 11)]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Appearance at Arraignment - Plea Not Guilty]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Appearance]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Filed]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Hearing]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark (No Doc #)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1043619
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =