open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Texas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Texas
    Case Number:5:19-cr-00492-1
    Party Name:USA v. Orosio
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript Filed]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Concerning Discovery & Pre-Trial Motions]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Accepting Waiver of Appearance at Arraignment]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Appearance at Arraignment - Plea Not Guilty]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Attorney]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Temporary Detention]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (SEALED)]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment Unsealed]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1042775
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =