open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Texas

TEXAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Texas
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00047-1
    Party Name:USA v. Jeremy Williams
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Accepting Waiver of Appearance at Arraignment]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Attorney]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Temporary Detention]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting District Court Arraignment]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Financial Status]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (SEALED)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1011206
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =