open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Texas

TEXAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Texas
    Case Number:6:19-cv-00578
    Party Name:Pryor v. Director, TDCJ-CID
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Fee Received]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Magistrate Availability]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?194056
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =