open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Texas

TEXAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Texas
    Case Number:4:19-cv-00871
    Party Name:Cunningham v. MLBN Health, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:March 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Fee Received]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Magistrate Availability]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.txed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?194054
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =