Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Utah

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Utah
    Case Number:19-20191
    Party Name:Jenny Lynn Schneider
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Continuing Confirmation Hearing]
    Date Published:June 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Order to Continue Chapter 13 Confirmation Hearing]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Chapter 13 Trustee's Endorsement Re: Motion to Continue Confirmation Hearing]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Notice of Endorsement (NO IMAGE)]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Motion to Continue Chapter 13 Plan Confirmation Hearing]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [PayGov Receipt of Fee Due]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Amended Document]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Chapter 13 Trustee's Continuing Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Chapter 13 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Declaration Re: Tax Returns]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Amended Schedules/List of Creditors/Statements (Dec 1 2016)]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Amended Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Order]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Notice of Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Convert Case to a Chapter 13 Case (order)]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Pending Order]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Trustee/USTR's Recommendation for Dismissal]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [*Notice and Opportunity for Hearing]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Motion to Convert to Chapter 13]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Certificate of Service Re: Miscellaneous Pleadings]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Clerk's Notice of Possible Previous Discharge]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Notice of Debtors Prior Filings]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [PayGov Receipt of Fee Due]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Credit Counseling Agency Briefing Certificate (Prefiling)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Statement of Financial Affairs and Schedules]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (22A-1 Supp)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (FEE)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [List of Creditors (Matrix) Upload]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.utb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?427532
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =