open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Utah

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Utah
    Case Number:19-23523
    Party Name:Rickie H. Morley and Angela V. Morley
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Order]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Dismissing Case - BK (Judge's Order) (order)]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Pending Order]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Minute Entry - Dismissed By Consent]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Chapter 13 Trustee's Continuing Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Set Objection to Dismissal Hearing]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Objection]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Electronically Paid Fee - INSTALLMENTS (FINAL)]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Chapter 13 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Chapter 13/7 Trustee's Objection to Claim of Exemption]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges (No Proof of Claim Filed)]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss (Generic)]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Amended Schedules/List of Creditors/Statements (Dec 1 2016)]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Request for Notice (With Image)]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Electronically Paid Fee - INSTALLMENTS (INTERIM)]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [PayGov Receipt of Fee Due]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Certificate of Service Re: Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Declaration/Affidavit Re: Tax Returns]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Statement of Financial Affairs and Schedules]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [BNC Certificate of Service Re: Deficiency Notice]
    Date Published:May 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:May 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [List of Creditors (Matrix) Upload]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (order)]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Deficiencies (13)]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Credit Counseling Agency Briefing Certificate (Prefiling)]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Motion)]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jenkins, tr Lon [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (FEE)]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.utb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?430934
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =