open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Utah

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Utah
    Case Number:19-23522
    Party Name:Debra Ann Herrera
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gillman, tr Duane H. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gillman, tr Duane H. [Clerk's Notice of Fees Due (Dismissed only)]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gillman, tr Duane H. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:July 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gillman, tr Duane H. [Recommendation for Dismissal (order)]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gillman, tr Duane H. [Withdrawal of Document (no image)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gillman, tr Duane H. [Show Cause for Failure to File Order (MOTION)]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gillman, tr Duane H. [Show Cause For Nonpayment of Filing Fees (INSTALLMENTS ONLY) (order)]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gillman, tr Duane H. [Trustee/USTR's Recommendation for Dismissal]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gillman, tr Duane H. [*Notice and Opportunity for Hearing]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gillman, tr Duane H. [Convert Case to 13 (Motion)]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gillman, tr Duane H. [PayGov Receipt of Fee Due]
    Date Published:June 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gillman, tr Duane H. [Electronically Paid Fee - INSTALLMENTS (INTERIM)]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gillman, tr Duane H. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gillman, tr Duane H. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1 Supp)]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gillman, tr Duane H. [Statement of Financial Affairs and Schedules]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gillman, tr Duane H. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:May 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gillman, tr Duane H. [Certificate of Service Re: Miscellaneous Pleadings]
    Date Published:May 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gillman, tr Duane H. [BNC Certificate of Service Re: Deficiency Notice]
    Date Published:May 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gillman, tr Duane H. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:May 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gillman, tr Duane H. [Clerk's Notice of Possible Previous Discharge]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gillman, tr Duane H. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (order)]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gillman, tr Duane H. [Deficiencies (7)]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gillman, tr Duane H. [Notice of Debtors Prior Filings]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gillman, tr Duane H. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gillman, tr Duane H. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Motion)]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gillman, tr Duane H. [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gillman, tr Duane H. [Credit Counseling Agency Briefing Certificate (Prefiling)]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gillman, tr Duane H. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (FEE)]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gillman, tr Duane H. [List of Creditors (Matrix) Upload]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.utb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?430933
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =