open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Utah

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Utah
    Case Number:19-24269
    Party Name:Michelle Marie Correa
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bailey, tr Steven R. [BNC Certificate of Service - Notice]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bailey, tr Steven R. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Request for Creditors to File Claims (NO IMAGE)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bailey, tr Steven R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bailey, tr Steven R. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bailey, tr Steven R. [Statement of Financial Affairs and Schedules]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bailey, tr Steven R. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1 Supp)]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bailey, tr Steven R. [BNC Certificate of Service Re: Deficiency Notice]
    Date Published:June 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bailey, tr Steven R. [PayGov Receipt of Fee Due]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bailey, tr Steven R. [Deficiencies (7)]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bailey, tr Steven R. [Notice of Debtors Prior Filings]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bailey, tr Steven R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bailey, tr Steven R. [Credit Counseling Agency Briefing Certificate (Prefiling)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bailey, tr Steven R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (FEE)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bailey, tr Steven R. [List of Creditors (Matrix) Upload]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bailey, tr Steven R. [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.utb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?431687
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =