open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00167
    Party Name:B. et al v. Blue Shield of California et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Vacate]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Vacate]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Initial Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Propose Schedule]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.utd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?114119
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =