open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Utah

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Utah
    Case Number:19-24275
    Party Name:Tyler Brittain and Alexis Brittain
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:August 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Amended Schedules/List of Creditors/Statements (Dec 1 2016)]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Statement of Financial Affairs and Schedules]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1 Supp)]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [BNC Certificate of Service Re: Deficiency Notice]
    Date Published:June 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Deficiencies (7)]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [PayGov Receipt of Fee Due]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Payment Advices/Evidence of Payment and/or Certification]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Credit Counseling Agency Briefing Certificate (Prefiling)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (FEE)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hunt, tr Mary M. [List of Creditors (Matrix) Upload]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.utb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?431693
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =