open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

UTAH PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00092
    Party Name:Great Western Leasing & Sales v. Impala Transport et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Propose Schedule]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.utd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?116109
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =