open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Utah

UTAH PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Utah
    Case Number:19-28989
    Party Name:Ashley Blair Folsom
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [BNC - Notice of Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:June 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:June 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Order]
    Date Published:April 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [Relief from Stay (order)]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [Pending Order]
    Date Published:April 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [*Notice and Opportunity for Hearing]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [Relief From Stay (FEE) (Motion)]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Request for Notice (No Image)]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [Discharging Debtor(s) (order) (AUTO)]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [BNC Certificate of Service - Notice]
    Date Published:February 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [Change of Address]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Request for Creditors to File Claims (NO IMAGE)]
    Date Published:January 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [PayGov Receipt of Fee Due]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (22A-1 Supp)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [Credit Counseling Agency Briefing Certificate (Prefiling)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (FEE)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [List of Creditors (Matrix) Upload]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [Statement of Financial Affairs and Schedules]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Loveridge, tr Elizabeth R. [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.utb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?436500
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =