open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Virginia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Virginia
    Case Number:19-30187-
    Party Name:Titilayo Shiyanbade
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shaia,, Jr Harry [Case Closed - Chapter 7 Full Administration]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shaia,, Jr Harry [CerCocTyp - BNC Certificate of Mailing of Discharge of Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shaia,, Jr Harry [BNC certificate of mailing of order]
    Date Published:May 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shaia,, Jr Harry [Automatic Discharge of Debtor(s) (Chapter 7 Only)]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shaia,, Jr Harry [Re: Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shaia,, Jr Harry [Hearing held; reaffirmation not approved (In re Husain)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shaia,, Jr Harry [CerDocTyp - Notice of Hearing (Docketed by BNC)]
    Date Published:April 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shaia,, Jr Harry [BNC Forms Request (VAN-022) Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:April 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shaia,, Jr Harry [Reaffirmation Cover Sheet and Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:April 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shaia,, Jr Harry [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shaia,, Jr Harry [Request for Notice/Service (Claimant Users Only)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shaia,, Jr Harry [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shaia,, Jr Harry [CerDocTyp - Notice of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shaia,, Jr Harry [CerDocTyp - Order to Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shaia,, Jr Harry [CerDocTyp - Notice of Electronic Filing Procedure]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shaia,, Jr Harry [CerDocTyp - Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Personal Financial Management]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shaia,, Jr Harry [Certification of Completion of Postpetition Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shaia,, Jr Harry [Notice to Cure Creditor Matrix Deficiency]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shaia,, Jr Harry [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Individual/Joint]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shaia,, Jr Harry [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shaia,, Jr Harry [none]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shaia,, Jr Harry [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.vaeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?700012
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =