Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Virginia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Virginia
    Case Number:19-10121-
    Party Name:Ana E Vallarino
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meiburger, Janet M. [Certification of Completion of Postpetition Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meiburger, Janet M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meiburger, Janet M. [Receipt of Second Installment of Petition Fee Paid]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meiburger, Janet M. [Receipt of First Installment of Petition Fee Paid]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meiburger, Janet M. [Receipt of Final Installment of Petition Fee Paid]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meiburger, Janet M. [Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists]
    Date Published:January 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meiburger, Janet M. [CerDocTyp - Notice of LBR 1006-1 Installment Payments]
    Date Published:January 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meiburger, Janet M. [BNC certificate of mailing of order]
    Date Published:January 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meiburger, Janet M. [CerDocTyp - Notice of LBR 1007-1 Deficiency]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meiburger, Janet M. [CerDocTyp - Notice of LBR 1007-3 Deficiency]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meiburger, Janet M. [CerDocTyp - Notice of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meiburger, Janet M. [CerDocTyp - Order to Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meiburger, Janet M. [CerDocTyp - Notice of Electronic Filing Procedure]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meiburger, Janet M. [CerDocTyp - Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Personal Financial Management]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meiburger, Janet M. [Order on Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meiburger, Janet M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meiburger, Janet M. [1 - Case Filing/Plan Deficiency]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meiburger, Janet M. [Notice to Cure Filing Fee Deficiency]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meiburger, Janet M. [Request for Notice/Service (Claimant Users Only)]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meiburger, Janet M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Individual/Joint]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.vaeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?700013
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =