open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Virginia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Virginia
    Case Number:19-50180-
    Party Name:Shelby Renee Dixon
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ruby, David R. [Case Closed - Chapter 7 Full Administration]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ruby, David R. [CerCocTyp - BNC Certificate of Mailing of Discharge of Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:May 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ruby, David R. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor(s) (Chapter 7 Only)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ruby, David R. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:April 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ruby, David R. [Meeting of Creditors Adjourned]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ruby, David R. [Certification of Completion of Postpetition Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ruby, David R. [Withdrawal and Substitution of Appearance (one pdf)]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ruby, David R. [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ruby, David R. [CerDocTyp - Notice of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ruby, David R. [CerDocTyp - Order to Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ruby, David R. [CerDocTyp - Notice of Electronic Filing Procedure]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ruby, David R. [CerDocTyp - Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Personal Financial Management]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ruby, David R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Individual/Joint]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ruby, David R. [none]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ruby, David R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ruby, David R. [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.vaeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?701452
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =