open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Virginia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Virginia
    Case Number:19-12302-
    Party Name:Lawrence Torres and Rosa E. Torres
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meiburger, Janet M. [Discharge of Debtor(s) (Chapter 7 Only)]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meiburger, Janet M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meiburger, Janet M. [Certification of Completion of Postpetition Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meiburger, Janet M. [CerDocTyp - 2nd Ntc of Requirement to Complete Course in Personal Financial Management]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meiburger, Janet M. [BNC Forms Request Notice of Requirement to File Certification About a Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meiburger, Janet M. [Meeting of Creditors Adjourned]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meiburger, Janet M. [Notice of Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meiburger, Janet M. [Re-Scheduled Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meiburger, Janet M. [CerDocTyp - Notice of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meiburger, Janet M. [CerDocTyp - Order to Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meiburger, Janet M. [CerDocTyp - Notice of Electronic Filing Procedure]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meiburger, Janet M. [CerDocTyp - Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Personal Financial Management]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Meiburger, Janet M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Individual/Joint]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.vaeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?709235
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =