open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Virginia

VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Virginia
    Case Number:20-11836-
    Party Name:Van My Dinh
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McCarthy, Kevin R. [BNC certificate of mailing of order]
    Date Published:September 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McCarthy, Kevin R. [Re: Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:September 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McCarthy, Kevin R. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McCarthy, Kevin R. [Reaffirmation Cover Sheet and Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:September 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McCarthy, Kevin R. [Certification of Completion of Postpetition Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McCarthy, Kevin R. [CerDocTyp - Notice of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McCarthy, Kevin R. [CerDocTyp - Order to Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McCarthy, Kevin R. [CerDocTyp - Notice of Electronic Filing Procedure]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McCarthy, Kevin R. [CerDocTyp - Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Personal Financial Management]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McCarthy, Kevin R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Individual/Joint]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McCarthy, Kevin R. [none]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McCarthy, Kevin R. [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McCarthy, Kevin R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.vaeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?726053
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =