open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Virginia

VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Virginia
    Case Number:20-33813-
    Party Name:Tashime J Massenburg
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barrett, Peter J. [BNC certificate of mailing]
    Date Published:September 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barrett, Peter J. [Notice to Cure Filing Fee Deficiency No VS Gorman]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barrett, Peter J. [CerDocTyp - Notice of LBR 1007-1 Deficiency]
    Date Published:September 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barrett, Peter J. [CerDocTyp - Notice of LBR 1007-3 Deficiency]
    Date Published:September 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barrett, Peter J. [CerDocTyp - Notice of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barrett, Peter J. [CerDocTyp - Order to Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:September 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barrett, Peter J. [CerDocTyp - Notice of Electronic Filing Procedure]
    Date Published:September 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barrett, Peter J. [CerDocTyp - Notice of Deficient Filing]
    Date Published:September 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barrett, Peter J. [CerDocTyp - Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Personal Financial Management]
    Date Published:September 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barrett, Peter J. [Deficient Filing Notice Request]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barrett, Peter J. [1 - Case Filing/Plan Deficiency]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barrett, Peter J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Individual/Joint]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Creditor Matrix Uploaded/Flash Drive Received]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Bankruptcy Petition Preparer's Notice, Declaration, and Signature (Form 119)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Official Form 121 - Statement About Social Security Number]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.vaeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?727161
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =