Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington
    Case Number:18-03364-7
    Party Name:Kelsey N. HILTON
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderton, Matthew J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Discharge of Debtor]
    Date Published:March 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderton, Matthew J [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case (text entry)]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderton, Matthew J [Automatic Discharge of Debtor (ch 7)]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderton, Matthew J [Payment of Fee - Installments Only]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderton, Matthew J [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderton, Matthew J [Objection]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderton, Matthew J [Dismiss Case Non-Payment of Filing Fee - Motion and Notice (form)]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderton, Matthew J [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notices]
    Date Published:January 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderton, Matthew J [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - RETIRED]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderton, Matthew J [Personal Financial Management Certification]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderton, Matthew J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ch 7 Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderton, Matthew J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:December 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderton, Matthew J [Order on Application To Pay Filing Fees in Installments (form)]
    Date Published:December 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderton, Matthew J [Request for Notices]
    Date Published:December 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderton, Matthew J [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderton, Matthew J [Statement of Witness]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderton, Matthew J [Declaration Regarding Payments (LBR 1007-1)]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderton, Matthew J [Notice of Stay]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderton, Matthew J [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderton, Matthew J [Statement of Social Security Number (will only be viewable by the court, trustee, USTR)]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderton, Matthew J [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderton, Matthew J [Filing Fee - Pay in Installments]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.waeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?204184
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =