Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Washington

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Washington
    Case Number:18-44131-
    Party Name:Lee Roy Chadwick
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Thacker, Don [Close Chapter 7 Case (automatic)]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Thacker, Don [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Thacker, Don [Discharge of Debtor, Chapter 7 (automatic)]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Thacker, Don [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - no funds auto]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Thacker, Don [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Thacker, Don [Certificate of Financial Management Course for Debtor]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Thacker, Don [Waive Filing Fee (order)]
    Date Published:December 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Thacker, Don [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Thacker, Don [Receipt of Fee (Generic)]
    Date Published:December 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Thacker, Don [Repeat Filer]
    Date Published:December 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Thacker, Don [341 Notice Prepare]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Thacker, Don [Creditors Uploaded]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Thacker, Don [Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Thacker, Don [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Individual No Asset]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Thacker, Don [Social Security Number(s) Statement - PDF viewable by court only]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Thacker, Don [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 (OTC)]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Thacker, Don [Waive Filing Fee ]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Thacker, Don [Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income 122A-1 (Formerly Chapter 7 Means Test)]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.wawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?658325
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =