Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington
    Case Number:1:18-cr-02072-1
    Party Name:USA v. Radillo-Contreras
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Order - Article III Judge]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Revoke]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order AO 199c]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reply Memorandum]
    Date Published:April 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revoke]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reopen Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Review Hearing]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Expedite]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reopen Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Expedite]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Compel]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Order]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Detention]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Rights]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Federal Defender]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing- By Court (MJ)]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Penalty Slip]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.waed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?84012
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =