Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington
    Case Number:1:18-cr-02076-1
    Party Name:USA v. Gomez-Olivera et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing on Motion-By Court]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Disclosure]
    Date Published:April 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sever Defendant]
    Date Published:April 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Praecipe]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing- By Court]
    Date Published:January 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Order - Article III Judge]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons by Deft in Support of the M/Continue Trial]
    Date Published:January 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice - Other]
    Date Published:January 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Expedite]
    Date Published:January 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:January 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:December 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Attorney Withdrawal & Substitution - Defendant]
    Date Published:December 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:December 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:December 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Plea]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Rights]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Cancellation and Notice of Hearing - By Court]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Penalty Slip]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.waed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?84005
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =