Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Washington

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Washington
    Case Number:2:18-cv-01781
    Party Name:Keybank National Association v. Spike Telecommunications Inc et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulated Motion]
    Date Published:March 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulated Motion]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [RSM Order Setting Trial Date and Related Dates(FORM)]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Status Report]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time-Other]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:January 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges]
    Date Published:December 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Redacted Document]
    Date Published:December 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:December 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Filer]
    Date Published:December 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:December 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Docket Text Modification]
    Date Published:December 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.wawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?267942
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =